Financial history THE HIVE CROYDON

Charity Number: 1149329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.26k £9.55k £5.93k £3.67k £340
Total expenditure £11.28k £4.85k £8.69k £5.73k £2.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.93k N/A N/A N/A N/A