UNIVERSITY OF WALES:TRINITY SAINT DAVID

Charity number: 1149535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scholarship and a commitment to the quality of the learning experience are central to the mission of the UoW: Trinity Saint David. Through academic programmes delivered on campus and in the workplace, and the range of activities delivered in schools and community venues, existing initiatives will be built upon to widen access to HE and encourage participation from under-represented groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Cardiff
  • Carmarthenshire
  • Ceredigion
  • City Of Swansea
  • Hackney

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 2012: Standard registration
  • 18 June 2015: Funds received from 1139800 SWANSEA METROPOLITAN UNIVERSITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PRIFYSGOL CYMRU: Y DRINDOD DEWI SANT (Working name)
  • UWTSD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katrin Shaw Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Dr Tracy Cruickshank Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Dr Deborah Jayne Hughes Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Maria Dinu Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
John Edge Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Professor Elwen Evans KC Trustee 01 September 2023
PRIFYSGOL CYMRU / THE UNIVERSITY OF WALES
Received: On time
Natalie Beard Trustee 07 July 2023
None on record
Nigel Roberts Trustee 30 March 2023
None on record
Professor Kyle Glenn Erickson Trustee 07 March 2023
None on record
Emlyn Dole Trustee 06 March 2023
PRIFYSGOL CYMRU / THE UNIVERSITY OF WALES
Received: On time
Timothy James Llewelyn Trustee 01 January 2023
ST DAVIDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
PRIFYSGOL CYMRU / THE UNIVERSITY OF WALES
Received: On time
Emlyn Michele James Griffith Schiavone Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Justin Thomas Albert Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Rowland Jones Trustee 27 September 2019
None on record
Geraint Roberts Trustee 27 September 2019
None on record
Dr Elizabeth Siberry Trustee 27 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £149.30m £173.87m £180.87m £183.12m £202.70m
Total expenditure £144.17m £165.67m £197.19m £193.99m £172.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £44.62m £64.15m £64.12m £60.59m £57.93m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £1.34m £0 £501.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £122.22m £145.92m £155.85m £155.66m £158.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £281.00k £1.13m £375.00k £1.39m £2.08m
Income - Other £26.80m £26.82m £23.31m £26.07m £41.46m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £98.66m £116.91m £147.70m £137.21m £115.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £49.49m £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £185.03k £187.00k £180.64k £196.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £9.93m £9.34m £9.03m £9.44m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £45.51m £48.76m £0 £56.77m £56.66m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £155.75m £154.04m £155.22m £153.52m £166.10m
Long-term investments £13.26m £10.66m £9.72m £10.27m £16.44m
Other assets £60.18m £87.64m £100.63m £90.57m £56.67m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£89.23m -£74.54m -£47.81m -£35.15m -£1.24m
Total liabilities £91.02m £100.83m £103.64m £105.18m £96.04m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 07 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 24 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 19 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 14 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 14 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
University Of Wales Trinity St. David
College Road
CARMARTHEN
United Kingdom
SA31 3EP
Phone:
01267 676767