Trustees Get Berkshire Active
Charity number: 1150486

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Parker | Chair | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Stephanie Wyatt | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Coveney | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Charles Strang | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Bradley | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Batchelor | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harjinder Singh Obhi | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Leach | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tameena Hussain | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Halliday | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.