Financial history THE CONVERSATION TRUST (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1151436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.55m £1.94m £2.21m £2.37m £2.28m
Total expenditure £1.40m £1.69m £2.02m £2.42m £2.52m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £82.43k £369.70k £247.81k £288.92k £321.84k
Income - Donations and legacies £151.48k £606.69k £2.21m £2.28m £2.16m
Income - Other trading activities £90.00k £0 £0 £33.45k £85.52k
Income - Charitable activities £1.31m £1.34m £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.16k
Income - Other £3.06k £1.37k £11 £49.39k £31.21k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.40m £1.69m £2.02m £2.30m £2.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £122.30k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £20.00k £29.85k £43.25k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0