THE WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND DEPENDANTS SOCIETY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES

Charity number: 503271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main object of the Society is to provide financial assistance to widow(er)s, orphans and dependants of deceased clergy who have previously served in the ministry of the Church in Wales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £136,753
Total expenditure: £146,327

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WODS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VENERABLE JONATHAN SIMON WILLIAMS Chair 03 January 2013
MONMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
MONMOUTH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE MONMOUTH DIOCESAN CLERGY WIDOWS & DEPENDANTS SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST WOOLOS, NEWPORT
Received: On time
The Venerable Matthew Hill Trustee 08 August 2024
FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S CHURCH (CARMARTHEN)
Received: On time
Timothy Llewelyn Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
The Venerable John Harvey Trustee 11 April 2024
None on record
Rev Caroline Ann Owen Trustee 07 February 2022
None on record
Rosamund Helen Crawford Trustee 11 January 2022
TANAT-VYRNWY MISSION AREA
Received: On time
Rev Andrew Stuart Grimwood Trustee 24 January 2019
THE ST ASAPH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP IN THE CHURCH IN WALES
Received: On time
KIM INSPIRE
Received: On time
Kay Warrington Trustee 22 February 2016
THE ARCHDEACONRIES CLERICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Gillian Brenda Knight Trustee
SWANSEA AND BRECON MOTHERS UNION
Received: On time
PETER EVANS LEA Trustee
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST WOOLOS, NEWPORT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £95.78k £93.41k £94.08k £121.15k £136.75k
Total expenditure £83.17k £92.29k £102.50k £136.83k £146.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 CALLAGHAN SQUARE
CARDIFF
CF10 5BT
Phone:
02920348228