Glossop and Tameside Methodist Circuit

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of regular public acts of worship open to members of the church and and non members alike. The teaching of Christianity through sermons etc, Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and services. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through activities generally and for other specific needs groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£662,053
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £270.28k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £296.63k | |
Other | £95.14k |
Total expenditure:
£388,958
Raising funds | £104.39k | |
Charitable activities | £284.57k | |
Other | £0 |
£1,717 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £104.39k | |
Charitable expenditure | £284.57k | |
Retained for future use | £273.10k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £104.39k | |
Charitable expenditure | £284.57k | |
Retained for future use | £274.81k |
People

3 Employee(s)
34 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Manchester City
- Tameside
Governance
- 21 January 2013: Standard registration
- 19 March 2025: Funds received from 1136791 ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE METHODIST CIRCUIT
- Glossop and Tameside Methodist Circuit (Working name)
- HYDE AND DENTON METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
34 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Hazel Ann Cook | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev GRAHAM TARN | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carol Sidebottom | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lai-Ying Eliza Ho | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Smith | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY Gregory | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Veitch | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Rothery | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mary Hewson | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Sidney Evans | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
LILIAN CULLEN | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CHAUHAN | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine louise Balfour | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
IRENE GWYNETH HIRST | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert John Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bernard Warin | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROWENA MELLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Phillips | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Burgess | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emmaline Saffron Krause | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Antony Pache | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MELLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
LARRAINE JEAN HORROCKS | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BLAIR | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JUDY EVANS | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Andrew Balfour | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allen Gordon Flowers | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gill Hall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Thorp | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Mason | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ELIZABETH MURPHY | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY WANJOHI | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN CHARLTON | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.87k | £148.32k | £337.68k | £379.59k | £662.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.21k | £125.64k | £424.78k | £523.04k | £388.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £270.28k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £296.63k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £95.14k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £284.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £104.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.80m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.41k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.04m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 16/04/1976 as amended on 21 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF THE UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION BEING A SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION, SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stalybridge Methodist Church
High Street
STALYBRIDGE
Cheshire
SK15 1SE
- Phone:
- 07875826437
- Email:
- admin@gtmethodist.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window