SALE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Six Methodist Churches within the Sale Circuit, as per our Annual report.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

25 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Trafford
Governance
- 24 April 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Douglas Couse | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Fielding | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gwyn Williams | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Armitage | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Burgess | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Corrinne Shirley Cecil Koromia | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Harry Bayley | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Clarkson | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Kaye | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Julian | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Glayne Worgan | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Colin Norman | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brian Rains | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stella Walker | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Norman | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Judith Meredith | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne Bennett | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ann Partington | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mabel Rudo Nyazika | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Burgess | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sue Cowlishaw | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Daysh | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Morris Loveland | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.81k | £149.13k | £137.23k | £164.74k | £236.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.43k | £156.54k | £179.50k | £195.96k | £171.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2024 | 258 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2024 | 258 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2024 | 623 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2024 | 623 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20/09/1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF THE UNION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF A - THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH B - AND CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH C - ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH D - ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
SALE METHODIST CIRCUIT
The Avenue Methodist Church
Wincham Road
SALE
M33 4PL
- Phone:
- 0161 962 2075
- Email:
- salecircuit@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window