LINCOLN DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides support for Church of England Schools throughout the diocese of Lincoln (Lincolnshire, North Lincolnshire and North East Lincolnshire). Promotes a christian ethos within these schools and their communities. Provides training in the teaching of Religious Education, school Improvement consultancy and services, governor and senior teacher training. Hosts schools festivals and other events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£599,932
Donations and legacies | £151.86k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £202.62k | |
Other | £245.45k |
Total expenditure:
£653,191
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £653.19k | |
Other | £0 |
£93,480 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £653.19k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £653.19k | |
Retained for future use | £40.22k |
People

8 Employee(s)
19 Trustee(s)
59 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 23 April 2013: Standard registration
- LINCOLN DBE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ven Dr Justine Penelope Heathcote Allain Chapman | Chair | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Fiona Beth Booth | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Leanne Holmes | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Victoria Lawrence | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
The Rt Revd Stephen David Conway | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Sudharshan Sarvananthan | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Revd Canon Nicholas James Watson Brown | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
PAUL DAVID BREWSTER | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Revd Canon Ian Robinson | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Prof Julian Stern | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Julie Kathleen Bacon | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sonya Yvonne Ely | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Georgina Machell | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Daphne Whiteoak | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Micheal Iain Adnitt | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alison Mary Warrick | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Hilary Beverley | Trustee | 07 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
CHERRY ANNE EDWARDS OBE | Trustee | 11 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
CANON Nicolete Fisher | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09m | £628.95k | £620.31k | £543.88k | £599.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £939.32k | £787.97k | £658.06k | £620.21k | £653.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £470.92k | £209.25k | £176.23k | £148.19k | £151.86k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £395.18k | £258.29k | £253.62k | £205.55k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £221.40k | £161.42k | £190.46k | £190.15k | £202.62k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £245.45k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £939.32k | £787.97k | £658.06k | £620.21k | £653.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £29.41k | £21.87k | £34.93k | £37.34k | £43.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £39.81k | £23.65k | £24.42k | £21.88k | £5.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £19.99k | £14.40k | £11.78k | £5.13k | £3.89k | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.27m | £5.35m | £5.83m | £5.34m | £5.40m | |
|
Other assets | £1.07m | £820.85k | £861.20k | £875.75k | £2.16m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £166.10k | £202.45k | £165.05k | £209.03k | £339.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 DEC 2012
Charitable objects
OBJECTS 1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE BOARD ARE: TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE DIOCESE. 1.2 THE OBJECTS SHALL BE CARRIED OUT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
LINCOLN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Edward King House
Minster Yard
LINCOLN
LN2 1PU
- Phone:
- 01522504010
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window