Financial history SEDGEFIELD OUT OF SCHOOL FUN CLUB

Charity number: 1151837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £96.55k £110.54k £107.44k £109.53k £126.21k
Total expenditure £84.02k £114.75k £114.79k £114.91k £126.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.18k £3.33k