THE TONI SCHIFF MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to support the provision of and/or the advancement of studies of the Jewish Holocaust. The Toni Schiff Memorial Fund supports the advancement of education by encouraging the study of the Jewish Holocaust both in its historical context and for its contemporary relevance. Guidelines for applicants are available on request.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 April 2013: Standard registration
- 05 November 2024: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- 05 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1171652 HOLOCAUST SURVIVORS' FRIENDSHIP ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £492 | £142 | £700 | £99 | £163 | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.68k | £24.08k | £1.27k | £2.19k | £2.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 464 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS AND AIMS OF THE ORGANISATION ARE TO SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF AND/OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF STUDIES OF THE JEWISH HOLOCAUST AS SET OUT IN THE DECLARATION OF TRUST
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window