Financial history SOUTHWELL MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity Number: 1153135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £80.98k £178.21k £180.63k £187.41k £193.03k
Total expenditure £58.97k £174.19k £188.21k £163.56k £192.26k
Income from government contracts N/A £47.94k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A