THE R N AND G MAINI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main focus of the charity activities is grants to education and scientific charities, and to charities with an emphasis on meeting otherwise un-met needs. The Trustees may make larger distributions in the future to a specific cause as or when such a specific cause is identified in keeping with the main focus of the Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 March 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR SIR RAVINDER NATH MAINI | Chair | 14 February 2013 |
|
|||||||
LADY GERALDINE RAINIER WALDEN MAINI FRACP | Trustee | 14 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR MARC FELDMANN FRS FMEDSC | Trustee | 14 February 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.47k | £6.92k | £6.71k | £8.13k | £10.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.73k | £8.68k | £9.45k | £8.54k | £10.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO PAY OR TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND (IF AND WHEN THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT) ALL OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL TO OR FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RATHBONE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT
8 FINSBURY CIRCUS
LONDON
EC2M 7AZ
- Phone:
- 02073990079
- Email:
- Edward.Sealy@rathbones.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window