LIVING WELL BROMLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a foodbank and support charity based in Penge, South East London. Our mission is to ensure that people have food, guidance and support of an uplifting community to live life to the fullest. Our services are free to use and include a foodbank, clothes bank, hot meals, free cafe, community choir, counselling and help with benefits,debt and housing issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
Governance
- 09 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Cornish | Chair | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan David Thomson | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan James Mason | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Short | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Claire Smith | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arthur William Skinner | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Noel Hanrahan | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Augustus Wells | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Anthony Godfrey Adams | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.74k | £309.87k | £204.24k | £407.35k | £421.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.59k | £172.16k | £248.08k | £255.89k | £374.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Jun 2014 as amended on 23 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF IN NEED OF PEOPLE IN BROMLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF A DROP-IN CENTRE PROVIDING A FOOD BANK FACILITY; HELP AND ADVICE WITH BENEFITS AND FINDING EMPLOYMENT; AND ALSO OFFERING SUPPORT WITH PARTNERS IN A VARIETY OF COUNSELLING WHERE REQUIRED FROM QUALIFIED INDIVIDUALS. THE CENTRE WILL ADDITIONALLY PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH
66 LENNARD ROAD
LONDON
SE20 7LX
- Phone:
- 02086598991
- Email:
- hello@livingwell.life
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window