QUARTET OF PEACE TRUST (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
QUARTET OF PEACE IS A REGISTERED CHARITY AND 100% OF THE PROFITS FROM THIS EVENT GO TO EDUCATING AND TRAINING GIFTED MUSICIANS WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE ABLE TO ADVANCE THEIR STUDIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- South Africa
Governance
- 02 April 2013: Standard registration
- UK FRIENDS OF THE SOUTH AFRICAN PEACE QUARTET TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Louise Lansdown | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Silva | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Sandra Jacobson | Trustee | 12 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.01k | £12.04k | £16.09k | £719 | £3.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.54k | £28.28k | £40.88k | £14.17k | £9.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 18/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION, THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY, THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS BY SUPPORTING THE "SOUTH AFRICAN PEACE QUARTET TRUST" (THE SAPQT), A PUBLIC BENEFIT ORGANISATION AND REGISTERED IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA WITH TRUST NUMBER IT1588/2012, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF LOCAL AND INTERNATIONAL MUSICAL PERFORMANCES, DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY INVOLVING FOUR STRING INSTRUMENTS, COLLECTIVELY KNOWN AS THE QUARTET OF PEACE, EACH OF WHICH IS DEDICATED TO SOUTH AFRICA'S FOUR NOBEL PEACE LAUREATES: VIOLIN - "FREEDOM" DEDICATED TO ALBERT LUTHULI; VIOLIN - "PEACE" DEDICATED TO DESMOND TUTU; VIOLA - "RECONCILIATION" DEDICATED TO F W DE KLERK; AND CELLO - "HOPE" DEDICATED TO NELSON MANDELA; AND 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS FROM DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SOUTH AFRICA BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE SAPQT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS IN MUSICAL PERFORMANCE, INSTRUMENT MAKING AND INSTRUMENT REPAIR BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, AWARDS AND OTHER FORMS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Andy Nash Accounting & Cons Ltd
Units 24 & 25
Goodsheds
Hood Road
Barry
CF62 5QU
- Phone:
- 02922741174
- Email:
- admn.qoptuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window