Financial history BUCKLAND NEWTON COMMUNITY PROPERTY TRUST

Charity Number: 1153817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £49.80k £53.23k £52.31k £55.77k £60.60k
Total expenditure £54.19k £39.24k £45.35k £53.70k £43.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A