Trustees BUCKLAND NEWTON COMMUNITY PROPERTY TRUST
Charity Number: 1153817

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW GEORGE STONE | Chair | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Hines | Trustee | 03 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WARING | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Antony John Tufnell Parson | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stella Maree Pollard | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lysander Hugh Vincent Parsons | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gill Watkin | Trustee | 07 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
NICKI BARKER | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACQUI CUFF | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.