ORCHARD LEIGH CAMPHILL COMMUNITY

Charity Number: 1151279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of services to adults with a range of learning disabilities, including accommodation, care and support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Anthony Nowlan Chair 28 April 2015
THORNLEIGH CAMPHILL COMMUNITIES LIMITED
Received: On time
CECILIE BRADSHAW Trustee 20 December 2017
None on record
Graham Snell Trustee 11 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Hatch Camphill Community
Hatch House
23 Castle Street
Thornbury
BRISTOL
BS35 1HQ
Phone:
01454413010
Website:

No information available