WINCOBANK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 25 October 1974: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pat Gatley | Trustee |
|
||||||
LYNN MOLLOY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAT TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD PERCIVAL GOLDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES RALPH WILLIAMS WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAYNE SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDDIE CRAIG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.58k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.58k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1013 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1013 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1378 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1378 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1743 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1743 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JULY 1974, AMENDED 3 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WINCOBANK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, DISABILITY, HEALTH STATUS, RELIGIOUS OR POLITICAL AFFILIATION, RACE, SEX OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL HAVE POWER TO AFFILIATE TO THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF COMMUNITY ASSOCIATIONS AND TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WINCOBANK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
176 STANDON ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S9 1PH
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window