Financial history BRENTWOOD SCHOOL CIO

Charity Number: 1153605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £29.94m £33.56m £37.31m £42.68m £44.93m
Total expenditure £26.41m £28.53m £32.08m £35.48m £39.92m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £419.33k £128.62k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £526.14k £213.61k £34.95k £71.70k £249.60k
Income - Other trading activities £1.11m £1.16m £1.61m £1.88m £1.98m
Income - Charitable activities £27.64m £31.79m £35.36m £39.00m £41.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £647.25k £394.10k £300.07k £1.72m £1.26m
Income - Other £14.05k £765 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £9.50k £0 £0 £0 £8.53k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £25.25m £26.95m £28.87m £31.04m £35.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.16m £1.57m £3.21m £4.44m £4.66m
Expenditure - Governance £24.45k £24.76k £23.70k £29.13k £29.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £191.08k £365.58k £708.35k £639.64k £698.06k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0