DALE STREET METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing regular acts of Christian worship open to all; providing space for prayer/ contemplation; supporting groups for bible study and fellowship; providing activities with a Christian ethos for the young, their carers, and the elderly; promoting the mission of the church; demonstrating care for the community through social projects and donations; providing space for community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 09 August 2013: Previously excepted registration
- 06 December 2022: Funds received from 1007428 AGE CONCERN LEAMINGTON SPA
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tina Jane Brooker | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
David Keverne Sandy | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Derek John Dwyer | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Avijit Mondal | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR JOHN PETHICK | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Iain Mark Ballard | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Ann Begg | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Edwina McConville | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JUNE GABBITAS | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM CHARLES HOWE | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH FERRER | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
TONY PARKINSON | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS PENNY SHARPLES | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|||||
MARK EDWARD WHITEHOUSE | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|||||
ANDREW TIMOTHY EMM | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|||||
Margaret Christine Weir | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN DARBY | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH MARY FREEMAN | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS JO PARKINSON | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA CHRISTINE RHODES | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK PREEDY | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.54k | £101.92k | £61.46k | £94.74k | £152.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.77k | £131.56k | £111.69k | £120.43k | £106.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dale Street Methodist Church
Dale Street
Leamington Spa
CV32 5HL
- Phone:
- 07479 556913
- Email:
- querycc@dalestreet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window