Financial history Ebenezer Baptist Chapel

Charity number: 1152197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £69.47k £73.41k £79.44k £81.49k £108.63k
Total expenditure £76.03k £77.61k £108.97k £104.27k £98.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A