THE KEYS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KEYS operates a programme of integrated medical, spiritual and community support for individuals with alcohol and drug addiction. The programme is operated by teams comprising mostly of volunteers within churches. The team operates from a conviction that by this holistic approach, issues often at the root of addictions will be dealt with in such a way that relapse becomes much less likely.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 October 2013: CIO registration
- KEYS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Keron Fletcher | Chair | 13 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Clarridge | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Llewellyn Ramos | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Tan Wae Teen | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Mary Elspeth Smith | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BARRATT | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.57k | £89.00k | £118.43k | £128.49k | £127.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.18k | £85.17k | £103.71k | £112.46k | £130.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DRUG AND ALCHOHOL MISUSE THROUGH A PROGRAMME OF DETOXIFICATION AND REHABILITATION IN ORDER TO HELP PRESERVE AND PROTECT THEIR GOOD HEALTH IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The KEYS Project
124-128 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 08006349638
- Email:
- admin@thekeysproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window