CANTERBURY FOOD BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Canterbury Food Bank operates within the Canterbury City Council District (Whitstable, Canterbury, Herne Bay and surrounding villages) to alleviate poverty through the provision of crisis food parcels, items, services and facilities to individuals in financial need and contributing to and cooperating with charities and other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£942,376
Donations and legacies | £926.23k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £16.15k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£752,449
Raising funds | £1.41k | |
Charitable activities | £751.04k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £196,995 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.41k | |
Charitable expenditure | £751.04k | |
Retained for future use | £189.93k |
People

9 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 12 September 2013: CIO registration
- 22 November 2022: Funds received from 281541 HERNE BAY PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin John Ward | Chair | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louisa-Jane Ping Ping Evans | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Ratcliffe | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Morounkeji Moses | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Alun Francis Edwards | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
David James Holt | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Penelope East Nicholls | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Riddell | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER FREDERICK TAYLOR-GOOBY | Trustee | 02 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.83k | £329.61k | £518.62k | £1.10m | £942.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.03k | £87.87k | £330.10k | £693.46k | £752.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £16.86k | £40.26k | £197.00k | £197.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £518.46k | £1.10m | £926.23k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £158 | £2.48k | £16.15k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £50.00k | £9 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £318.13k | £671.33k | £751.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £11.97k | £22.13k | £1.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £974 | £9.45k | £1.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £15.23k | £63.71k | £74.52k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £471.59k | £834.50k | £1.02m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £1.72k | £3.77k | £7.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Sep 2013 as amended on 02 May 2018 as amended on 25 Jul 2022 as amended on 31 Oct 2024 as amended on 02 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
The prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship in the Canterbury City Council district (as defined at the date of this constitution) in particular but not exclusively by: i) The provision of emergency food parcels together with other related supplies, along with items, services and facilities connected with the preparation and serving of emergency food supplies to individuals and family groups in financial crisis; ii) To provide financial support with domestic energy costs for those individuals and families in need; and iii) To campaign on issues to prevent or relieve poverty that include, but are not limited to, initiating and running projects solely, or contributing to, or cooperating with, charities, other organisations, and the media.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 29
Joseph Wilson Industrial Estate
Millstrood Road
WHITSTABLE
Kent
CT5 3PS
- Phone:
- 01227936450
- Email:
- info@canterburyfoodbank.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window