THE TDS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The TDS Charitable Foundation exists to raise standards in the private rented sector (mainly through the promotion of education in rights and responsibilities of landlords and tenants) and to promote the wider use of Alternative Dispute Resolution mechanisms to deal with tenant and landlord disputes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 October 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Noelle Quigley | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Nicolette Alvey | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Threader | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shahad Choudhury | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Jonathan Richard Cox | Trustee | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN BLAKEY | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Harriott | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.62k | £78.52k | £100.00k | £440.33k | £234.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.94k | £96.57k | £31.92k | £95.90k | £145.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 23 OCT 2013 AMENDED ON 14 OCT 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: [A] THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS IN OVERCOMING BARRIERS FOR INDIVIDUALS TO ACCESS AND SUSTAIN GOOD QUALITY, DECENT, SAFE, COMPLIANT AND ENERGY EFFICIENT HOUSING IN THE PRIVATE RENTED SECTOR. [B] THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED THROUGH PROMOTING, UNDERTAKING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO HARDSHIP AND DISADVANTAGE IN THE PRIVATE RENTED SECTOR AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE THESE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED MEANS THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR BEING TRANSGENDER; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR POTENTIALLY AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS; CRIME - EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY. [C] TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ABOUT HOUSING RIGHTS AND OBLIGATIONS IN GENERAL, AND IN PARTICULAR ABOUT (A) BEST PRACTICE IN THE MANAGEMENT OF PRIVATE RENTED HOUSING, (B) LEGAL RIGHTS AND OBLIGATIONS WHICH ARE OF PARTICULAR RELEVANCE TO THOSE WHO ARE INVOLVED IN THE PROVISION OR MANAGEMENT OF PRIVATE RENTED HOUSING OR WHO HOLD TENANCIES WITHIN THE PRIVATE RENTED HOUSING SECTOR AND (C) USE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESSES FOR THE MORE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE RESOLUTION OF DISPUTES BETWEEN LANDLORDS AND TENANTS [D] TO ADVANCE CONFLICT RESOLUTION THROUGH PROMOTING THE USE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESSES FOR THE MORE EFFICIENT RESOLUTION OF DISPUTES BETWEEN LANDLORDS AND TENANTS WITHIN THE PRIVATE RENTED HOUSING SECTOR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Dispute Service Limited
West Wing First Floor
The Maylands Building
200 Maylands Avenue
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP2 7TG
- Phone:
- 01442218031
- Email:
- info@tdsfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window