HEARTLINE FAMILIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heartline supports children with heart disorders and their families, whatever the condition, wherever it is treated. We provide an online Forum, 'Heart Children' , a comprehensive handbook for parents, wetsuits for heart children, caravan holidays and activity breaks for heart children and separately their siblings. We offer bereaved families a place to remember their child.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- HEARTLINE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alasdair James Marshall | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Leonard | Trustee | 14 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Collins | Trustee | 14 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Jayne King | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE JAMIE PERSOGLIO | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.27k | £66.93k | £10.72k | £35.09k | £36.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.18k | £38.20k | £36.63k | £34.95k | £39.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 September 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 September 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 September 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 13 September 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Aug 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH, AND WELLBEING OF CHILDREN WITH HEART DISORDERS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE FACILITATION OF APPROPRIATE SOCIAL SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO HEART DISORDERS IN CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Nobles Close
Coates
Whittlesey
PETERBOROUGH
PE7 2BT
- Phone:
- 07949 256302
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window