Financial history MSC ASSESSMENT

Charity Number: 1153045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £840.29k £512.92k £498.40k £291.13k £203.34k
Total expenditure £1.12m £471.40k £453.13k £264.49k £245.60k
Income from government contracts £35.67k £65.00k £68.05k £70.13k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £840.29k £512.92k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.12m £471.40k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £12.40k £9.27k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A