Financial history BRITISH SARCOMA GROUP

Charity number: 1154928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £103.70k £32.25k £101.20k £107.13k £105.99k
Total expenditure £95.69k £42.18k £99.41k £110.70k £97.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A