BRITISH SARCOMA GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide best practice info in treatment Annual event Scientific meetings Guidelines & service standards NHS representation through responses & advisory group membership Projects to improve healthcare & treatment Inform professionals about research Provide info & training to medical professionals Work with professionals & patients to develop joint educational initiatives & raise awareness
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 December 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Elizabeth Alsousou | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johanne Vass | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander Thomas John Lee | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Benson | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Louise Artis | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Millman | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sherron Furtado | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anant Desai | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Adam Dangoor | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG HAMILTON GERRAND | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN HAYES | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.70k | £32.25k | £101.20k | £107.13k | £105.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.69k | £42.18k | £99.41k | £110.70k | £97.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE (1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY MAINTAINING AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF MEDICAL, NURSING AND HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM CONCERNED WITH THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PATIENTS WITH BONE AND SOFT TISSUE SARCOMAS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, TRAINING, AND THE IDENTIFICATION OF BEST PRACTICE; (2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROMOTION OF EXCELLENCE IN THE HEALTHCARE AND THE TREATMENT OF PATIENTS WITH BONE AND SOFT TISSUE SARCOMA, THROUGH ENABLING TREATMENT SPECIALISTS TO IDENTIFY AND SHARE BEST PRACTICE; (3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH WITH THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF MORE EFFECTIVE TREATMENT AND CARE FOR PATIENTS WITH BONE AND SOFT TISSUE SARCOMAS; (4) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO SARCOMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 14 The Stottie Shed
Baker's Yard
Christon Road
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 1XD
- Phone:
- 01912442581
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window