Financial history BARNSLEY FOOD BANK PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1153906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £84.26k £144.51k £152.15k £70.00k £228.28k
Total expenditure £55.15k £66.62k £78.43k £190.00k £199.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £33.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.00k £40.00k £37.00k £60.00k