KAIROS REHABILITATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide medical therapeutic and social rehabilitation of patients with long-term hard to treat conditions, in particular pain. Research the efficacy of the methods used. Share outcomes/ strategies with professionals in our field. Provide CPD activities for professionals in the field of anthroposophic medicine. Support patients in dealings with the DWP.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2024
Total income includes £150,767 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Greenwich
Governance
- 06 June 2014: CIO registration
- 24 June 2015: Funds received from 1094580 THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF ANTHROPOSOPHIC PHARMACI...
- KAIROS KAIROS REHABILITATION TRUST (Previous name)
- KAIROS TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Perry Charles O'Callaghan | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|||||||
Dr David McGavin GP | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ELLEN WRIGHT | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||
SIMON FIELDING OBE | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2020 | 01/06/2021 | 01/06/2022 | 01/06/2023 | 01/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.69k | £94.82k | £94.82k | £120.48k | £154.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.51k | £91.02k | £91.02k | £101.22k | £132.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £73.30k | £75.91k | £75.91k | £116.17k | £150.77k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH WITHIN THE COMMUNITY THROUGH THE USE AND PRACTICE OF THE PRINCIPLES OF ANTHROPOSOPHIC MEDICINE IN COMBINATION WITH ANY OTHER CONVENTIONAL OR EVIDENCE BASED THERAPEUTIC MODALITIES THAT MIGHT BE INDICATED. IN FURTHERING THIS OBJECT THE CIO WILL PAY ATTENTION TO THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, UNEMPLOYMENT OR OTHER REASONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Herons Gate Medical Centre
1A Goosander Way
LONDON
SE28 0ER
- Phone:
- 07712810108
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window