ST ETHELDREDA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a place of Roman Catholic worship open to members of the general public, served by a resident Roman Catholic priest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 November 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fr Joseph O'Reilly IC | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Fr Tom Thomas | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Fr Christopher John Fuse IC | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Fr David John Myers IC | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Fr Tony Furlong IC | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.09k | £131.95k | £161.31k | £207.41k | £242.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.13k | £89.00k | £58.35k | £98.59k | £182.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JUL 1885
Charitable objects
(1) TO HOLD AND MAKE AVAILABLE THE CHAPEL OF ST ETHELDREDA'S, ELY PLACE, LONDON EC1N 6RY FOR THE PURPOSES OF A ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH AND THE CONDUCT OF ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGIOUS SERVICES TO BE SERVED OR OFFICIATED IN SOLELY AND EXCLUSIVELY BY ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIESTS. (2) TO HOLD AND MAKE AVAILABLE OTHER PREMISES OWNED BY THE TRUST FOR THE RESIDENCE OF THE PRIEST OR PRIESTS BY WHOM THE SAID CHURCH SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE SERVED. (3) TO LET THE PREMISES OWNED BY THE TRUST (OR ANY PART THEREOF) AT SUCH RENT AND GENERALLY UPON SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT AND TO APPLY ANY SUCH RENTS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PROMOTION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Etheldredas Catholic Church
14 Ely Place
London
EC1N 6RY
- Phone:
- 02074051061
- Email:
- enquiries@stetheldreda.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window