BRADFORD DISABILITY FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have over 100 members who have a broad range of both physical and learning disabilities. We hold weekly football training which are accessible to anyone age 6 and over with a disability. We participate in competitive football matches and tournaments in disability football leagues. In addition to football sessions we offer social events and activities to our members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 28 July 2014: Standard registration
- 18 July 2023: Funds received from 509020 SCOPE IN BRADFORD
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Parr | Chair | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Allan David Watt | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Gibson | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Butler | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lightowler | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Whittle | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Parnaby | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Parnaby | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Cliffe | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Stead | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clayton | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Knights | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Squires | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Winn | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.52k | £9.45k | £33.70k | £37.18k | £48.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.15k | £6.37k | £24.80k | £33.15k | £49.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 2001 AS AMENDED ON 23/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Chapel Close
Cross Roads
Keighley
BD22 9AD
- Phone:
- 07879 495200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window