Financial history TRUST MUSIC

Charity number: 1156540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £63.67k £55.72k £68.25k £24.35k £53.14k
Total expenditure £79.29k £111.05k £94.05k £31.70k £42.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.28k £19.63k N/A N/A N/A