Financial history FUTURE FACES

Charity number: 1155736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £53.28k £70.29k £89.17k £78.57k £40.42k
Total expenditure £41.97k £60.03k £69.81k £43.67k £38.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A