COUNTESS MOUNTBATTEN OF BURMA ROMSEY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support for the elderly in need in the Romsey and surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 04 February 2014: CIO registration
- 15 December 2014: Funds received from 206009 COUNTESS MOUNTBATTEN OF BURMA ROMSEY MEMORIAL TRUS...
- EDWINA MOUNTBATTEN HOUSE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Gutsell | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Jordan-Baker | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Lady Alexandra Knatchbull | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr FRANK MACDONALD AKERMAN | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
THE RT HON THE COUNTESS MOUNTBATTEN OF BURMA | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £683.88k | £774.34k | £932.75k | £86.75k | £27.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £617.76k | £655.00k | £952.01k | £316.20k | £24.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £31.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.95k | £69.07k | £51.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £657.74k | £647.63k | £881.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.45k | £1.61k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £12.75k | £56.40k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £617.76k | £655.00k | £952.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £47.09k | £15.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 04 FEB 2014 AMENDED ON 21 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Estate Office
Broadlands
Romsey
Hampshire
SO51 9ZD
- Phone:
- 01794505080
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window