Financial history THE CHELLINGTON CENTRE

Charity number: 1156511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £142.40k £265.41k £157.38k £139.08k £269.33k
Total expenditure £98.36k £101.46k £114.95k £149.51k £167.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.40k £27.53k £2.67k N/A £3.07k