Financial history Rentstart (UK) Ltd

Charity number: 1156746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.17m £1.43m £1.15m £1.23m £1.39m
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.39m £1.29m £1.25m £1.40m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £152.35k £383.63k £234.76k £361.40k £215.74k
Income - Donations and legacies £73.67k £597.18k £265.92k £396.76k £349.21k
Income - Other trading activities £670.59k £837.32k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £267.90k £0 £881.33k £837.15k £1.04m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £553 £406 £152 £265 £978
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.36m £1.27m £1.24m £1.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £24.24k £29.51k £12.31k £10.30k £12.02k
Expenditure - Governance £7.86k £0 £10.53k £10.53k £8.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0