RUTLAND MUSIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rutland Music Trust exists (for the public benefit) to 1)advance education within the framework of the arts;2)advance the arts & culture by promoting & facilitating access to and performance of music & other art forms;3)provide for the recreation of children, young people & adults by providing facilities & services in the interests of social welfare with the object of improving conditions of life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £28,451 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rutland
Governance
- 11 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER DAVIS | Chair | 14 February 2014 |
|
|||||||
ROBERT EDWARD CLAYTON | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
Robert Gooding | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Benjamin James Solly | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.58k | £74.96k | £52.25k | £53.19k | £28.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.28k | £88.40k | £58.76k | £63.63k | £36.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £51.76k | N/A | £52.25k | £53.19k | £28.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 236 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 February 2025 | 602 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 February 2025 | 602 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 August 2020 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 August 2020 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JAN 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: - TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY (WITHOUT LIMITATION) WITHIN THE FRAMEWORK OF THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF RUTLAND AND ELSEWHERE; AND - TO ADVANCE THE ARTS AND CULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROMOTING AND FACILITATING ACCESS TO AND PERFORMANCES OF MUSIC AND OTHER ART FORMS; AND - TO PROVIDE FOR THE RECREATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO THEM IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
125-129 KETTERING ROAD
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 4AZ
- Phone:
- 01604637117
- Email:
- Rutlandmusic@NMPAT.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window