West Sussex Mind

Charity number: 1155918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Work in Worthing, Littlehampton, Bognor, Chichester and Midhurst providing a range of services including: Recovery focused 1:1, group and drop-in support for adults, Specialist services for post natal support, Young peoples 1:1 and group support, Social day support for older adults with mental health needs, Support for carers of and individuals with dementia.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 2014: Standard registration
  • 08 September 2014: Funds received from 260274 COASTAL WEST SUSSEX MIND
  • 28 January 2015: Funds received from 1131896 CHICHESTER AREA MIND (CHICHESTER DISTRICT AND BOGN...
  • 19 August 2021: Funds received from 1114956 SHOREHAM AND DISTRICT MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • COASTAL WEST SUSSEX MIND (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Hawker Chair 30 March 2016
None on record
Nicola Gibbins Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
GAVIN ATKINS Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Rebecca Hills Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Samantha Taylor Howell Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Tanya Marwaha Trustee 26 May 2022
THE BATON OF HOPE UK
Recently registered
Kirk Lord Trustee 17 November 2020
None on record
Nigel Jones Trustee 24 September 2020
THE GRACE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE COCHRANE COLLABORATION
Received: On time
Matthew Copeland Trustee 24 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, FELPHAM
Received: On time
OLLY'S FUTURE
Received: On time
Martin Sherred Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
Daniel William Bird Trustee 05 March 2014
None on record
ROBERT JOHN SMYTHERMAN Trustee 18 February 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.69m £2.30m £2.50m £2.95m £3.24m
Total expenditure £1.67m £2.05m £2.52m £2.76m £3.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £2.13m £2.28m £2.37m
Income from government grants £885.36k £1.65m N/A £31.07k £38.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.04m £308.65k £72.87k £164.51k £231.01k
Income - Other trading activities £10.97k £0 £0 £3.29k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.98m £2.42m £2.76m £2.93m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.15k £13.81k £10.83k £25.42k £71.32k
Income - Other £0 £3 £2.98k £3.31k £3.45k
Income - Legacies £8.85k £5.00k £6.98k £50.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.62m £2.00m £2.47m £2.71m £3.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £52.62k £49.55k £51.54k £57.68k £123.61k
Expenditure - Governance £10.79k £11.06k £7.06k £9.32k £10.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £42.39k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.06m £1.05m £1.19m £1.67m £1.67m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.01m £2.15m £2.10m £2.20m £2.15m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £311.00k £187.68k £292.51k £189.69k £193.43k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE GATEWAY
8-10 DURRINGTON LANE
WORTHING
WEST SUSSEX
UNITED K
Phone:
01903277000