SMART CHOICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Smart Choices promotes the safety and well being of 'at risk' young people and empowers them to make choices to avoid violence and conflict Smart Choices provide a range of programmes and interventions designed to give vulnerable young people tools and techniques to break the cycle of youth violence, help them become emotionally resilient and be responsible citizens who fulfil their potential
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 May 2014: CIO registration
- FOR JIMMY (Previous name)
- THE JIMMY MIZEN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BILL GRIFFITHS | Chair | 18 March 2014 |
|
|||||
KABBA NJIE | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gethin Davies Knapp | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Nickols | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £493.90k | £192.29k | £96.60k | £503 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £460.92k | £207.30k | £94.89k | £555 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £103.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 April 2025 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 05 February 2025 | 524 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 17 February 2025 | 536 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 July 2024 | 700 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 July 2024 | 700 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 July 2024 | 1065 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 July 2024 | 1065 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 05 January 2023 | 857 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 05 January 2023 | 857 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 08 MAY 2014 AMENDED ON 05/12/2015 as amended on 01 May 2020 as amended on 01 May 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are to: 3.1 break the cycle of youth violence by: 3.1.1 promoting the safety and wellbeing of young people; 3.1.2 providing or assisting in the provision of activities that will enable young people to participate within the community as independent and responsible individuals; and 3.1.3 empowering young people to make choices that avoid conflict. 3.2 promote any other purpose that is charitable in accordance with the laws of England and Wales that supports or assists young people and those affected by crime.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Cambridge Drive
LONDON
SE12 8AJ
- Phone:
- 02088527855
- Email:
- hello@forjimmy.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window