YORKSHIRE THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of theological education validated by Durham University under the Common Awards Scheme. The scheme is open to those who wish to train for lay or ordained ministry and for independent students who have a genuine interest in pursuing study in theology, ministry and mission. Opportunities to study programmes are provided at nine different locations spread across the whole of Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 July 2014: CIO registration
- YTEP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Eleanor Marion Wort | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel McGinnis | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev'd Dr Ian MacDonald McIntosh | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Rt Revd Mark Crispin Rake Sowerby | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.74k | £98.19k | £89.33k | £92.41k | £83.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.13k | £90.86k | £87.79k | £88.28k | £86.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Jul 2014 as amended on 02 May 2023
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE MINISTERIAL EDUCATION AND FOR BOTH ORDAINED AND LAY MEMBERS OF THE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES; AND 2)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THEOLOGICAL AND MINISTERIAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THOSE WITH A PERSONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O THE MIRFIELD CENTRE
STOCKS BANK ROAD
MIRFIELD
WF14 0BW
- Phone:
- 07762 102656
- Email:
- ytep@mirfield.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window