OCEAN WATERSPORTS TRUST VALE OF GLAMORGAN

Charity number: 1157946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation, by the provision of facilities for the community, including facilitating water activities.,

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,664
Total expenditure: £10,485

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Vale Of Glamorgan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 July 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BARRY COMMUNITY WATER ACTIVITIES CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER HEDLEY BASTEN Chair 16 November 2013
None on record
Jill Gorin Trustee 24 November 2023
None on record
Christian Parsons Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
Alun Cairns MP Trustee 23 March 2020
None on record
NIGEL GORDON VICK Trustee 13 July 2018
None on record
HEATHER STEVENS Trustee 05 April 2014
THE WATERLOO FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARTIN WILLIAM WESTWOOD MA FRAES Trustee 17 January 2014
PORTSMOUTH NAVAL GLIDING CENTRE
Received: On time
JANE ELIZABETH HUTT Trustee 16 November 2013
VALE OF GLAMORGAN YOUTH FORUM
Received: On time
John Keith Williams Trustee 13 November 2013
5TH BARRY (SALEM BAPTIST) SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Barry Ministry Area
Received: On time
CARDIFF AND VALE AREA SCOUT COUNCIL
VALEPLUS (CYMRU) & VALEPLUS EXTRA
Received: On time
TIR A MOR DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: 17 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.95k £31.22k £38.92k £28.59k £9.66k
Total expenditure £53.47k £51.08k £27.83k £18.34k £10.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £4.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 REGENT STREET
BARRY
CF62 8DT
Phone:
07812930001
Website:

bcwac.org.uk