VINTAGE CARRIAGES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The education of the public through the establishment of a railway museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Margaret Wilson | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Yewdall | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Aynge Carlton | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|||||
David Cullingworth | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Alexandra Jacqueline Stockdale-Haley | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Cross | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Robert James Taggart | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bob Sprot | Trustee | 13 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NORMAN CARR | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|||||
TREVOR ROYSTON ENGLAND | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|||||
IAN BARRY SMITH | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|||||
SHEILA ANN SEABROOK | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.13k | £142.02k | £144.69k | £166.28k | £217.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.16k | £93.75k | £101.31k | £127.43k | £139.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 06 May 2014
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A RAILWAY MUSEUM (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF CONSTITUTION).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vintage Carriages Trust
Railway Station
Station Road
Haworth
Keighley
BD22 8NJ
- Phone:
- 01535680425
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window