Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE EPIPHANY GIPTON, LEEDS

Charity number: 1157658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £38.64k £66.37k £30.04k £28.21k £30.59k
Total expenditure £34.99k £80.96k £31.76k £39.70k £34.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.00k N/A N/A