TWICKFOLK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The study, practice and encouragement of folk music in all its forms in order to foster public knowledge and appreciation of such music by means of public performance or otherwise, including training and education of folk singers and instrument players, male or female, from all age groups and backgrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hounslow
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 November 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN PAUL VILE | Chair | 14 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Riikka Gregorowski | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Solman | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Joseph Kenny | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Sue Graves | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.61k | £1.23k | £1.83k | £7.74k | £10.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.86k | £1.48k | £2.05k | £8.76k | £9.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 July 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 July 2024 | 272 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ART OF FOLK MUSIC IN ALL ITS FORMS, BY ENCOURAGING ITS STUDY AND PRACTICE IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC THROUGH PUBLIC PERFORMANCES OR OTHERWISE INCLUDING TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF FOLK MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Norfolk Cottage
The Chase
Pinner
HA5 5QP
- Phone:
- 02088662621
- Email:
- info@twickfolk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window