Financial history BURY ST EDMUNDS' FRIENDLY ORCHESTRA

Charity Number: 1157702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £14.62k £5.36k £12.11k £15.43k £12.32k
Total expenditure £14.03k £6.23k £10.61k £12.74k £12.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A