NEPAL VILLAGE FOUNDATION, UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nepal Village Foundation is a UK-based organisation. We work very closely with Dalit and poorest of the poor in rural villages of Nepal. We work with them to improve their wellbeing by enabling access to education and learning. We will strengthen villages to enable change to happen in an enduring way so they can determine their own futures and make good use of the resources available to them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nepal
Governance
- 09 September 2014: Standard registration
- NVF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Lister | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Pugh | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pat Warrington | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Dickinson | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ewan Newton | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LINES | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|||||
JAN KING | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAM MILLER BA | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carole Sharma | Trustee | 08 December 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.62k | £12.96k | £7.65k | £15.05k | £9.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.05k | £9.83k | £8.69k | £10.59k | £11.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/12/2007 AS AMENDED ON 29/07/2014 AS AMENDED ON 06/09/2014
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR AMONG GIRLS FROM POOR FAMILIES IN RURAL NEPAL WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE RECEIVE A FORMAL EDUCATION. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN RURAL AREAS OF NEPAL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 3) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF RURAL NEPAL IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 CANON BECK ROAD
LONDON
SE16 6DF
- Phone:
- 07954376665
- Email:
- info@nvf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window