Financial history THE FLORENCE NIGHTINGALE AID IN SICKNESS TRUST

Charity number: 1157980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £341.88k £363.98k £382.07k £399.45k £433.29k
Total expenditure £486.18k £432.01k £402.57k £418.40k £497.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A