Financial history SCHOOLREADERS

Charity Number: 1159157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £505.88k £544.87k £564.84k £747.41k £1.66m
Total expenditure £309.72k £364.57k £524.50k £737.78k £994.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.22k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £468.44k £541.85k £550.79k £727.14k £1.63m
Income - Other trading activities £33.52k £1.77k £13.71k £14.60k £2.89k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £431 £43 £340 £5.67k £34.63k
Income - Other £3.50k £1.22k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £221.29k £254.53k £378.75k £495.95k £819.07k
Expenditure - Raising funds £88.42k £110.04k £145.75k £241.83k £175.86k
Expenditure - Governance £18.67k £22.91k £31.31k £37.13k £14.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £1.02k £2.36k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0