THE COLCHESTER HALF MARATHON

Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 08 April 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organisation of The Colchester Half Marathon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 04 November 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL ALDWORTH | Chair | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jack Simpson | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CASS | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
LUKE WASTELL | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD POWELL | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR JOHN MACKENZIE PHD MCIM | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HART FCCA | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|||||
JAMES RICHARD LEWIS BA HONS | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.09k | £69.37k | £0 | £92.77k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.32k | £62.61k | £0 | £106.27k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 March 2025 | 313 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 March 2025 | 313 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 April 2021 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 April 2021 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS IN COLCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Broomfield Way
BRAINTREE
Essex
CM7 2DA
- Phone:
- 07398721556
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window